skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/04/2019 2:33:07 PM

Liau, Siong Seng

CPSO#: 99841

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 29 Jan 2013 to 19 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2014