skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 6:42:55 AM

Ee, Mong Tieng

CPSO#: 99777

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Malaya, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C
Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Malaysia

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MONG TIENG EE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. EE is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. EE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. EE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. EE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. EE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. EE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 25 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 23 Sep 2018
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018