skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/04/2019 8:31:45 PM

Eeson, Gareth Aiden

CPSO#: 99742

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Princess Margaret Hospital Department of Surgical Oncology Room 3-130 610 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Date Received: 30 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2013 to 08 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 8 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016