skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:42:58 AM

Bruce, Erin Mary

CPSO#: 99732

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 08 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2016