skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 6:21:46 PM

Webster, Lindsay Leigh Mary

CPSO#: 99528

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Garrison Creek Site
928 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON  M6C 1C6
Phone: (416) 603-5888
Fax: 416-603-5059 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Don Mills Family Health Team
#200 - 20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (416) 444-6161
Fax: (416) 444-5849
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LINDSAY LEIGH MARY WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2014