skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 4:11:51 PM

Kurtz, Veronika

CPSO#: 99520

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
444 Douro St Suite 201
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 271-7172
Fax: (519) 271-3124 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Prout & Kurtz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Prout ( CPSO# 99508 )
Dr. V. Kurtz ( CPSO# 99520 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 271-3200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VERONIKA KURTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014