skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 5:47:33 AM

Gucer, Hasan

CPSO#: 99484

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Karadeniz Technical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 09 Oct 2012 to 07 Dec 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 08 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013