skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 10:20:09 PM

Alabdullah, Hafez Mahmoud

CPSO#: 99472

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Damascus, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 23 Dec 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 24 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2014