skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/07/2019 9:03:09 PM

Singh, Sandhya Kavita V

CPSO#: 99364

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Sep 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Care
1755 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1P 0A3
Phone: (416) 290-0361
Fax: (416) 290-5986 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Appletree
4700 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J1P3
Canada
Phone: 4164798649
Fax: 4167365523
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sandhya Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singh ( CPSO# 99364 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
4700 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 1P3
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Business Address:
One Care
1755 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1P 0A3
Phone Number: (416) 290-0361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Sep 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014 Active
             Dr. Sandhya Kavita V. Singh may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.