skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/07/2019 2:32:36 PM

De Guzman, Maria Cecilia

CPSO#: 99316

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of The Visayas, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 27 Aug 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2014