skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 2:17:25 AM

Preto Zamperlini, Marcela

CPSO#: 99117

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Pontificia Univ Catolica De Campinas, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014