skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 4:09:28 PM

Ahmed, Rania Ahmed Abdullah

CPSO#: 99053

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dubai Medical College For Girls, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 19 Jul 2012 to 04 Oct 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013