skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/04/2019 8:53:26 PM

Davenport, Stephanie Ruth

CPSO#: 98728

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE RUTH DAVENPORT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVENPORT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 19 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 11 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2017