skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 4:00:53 AM

Hahn, Sara Catharine

CPSO#: 98719

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 740-4940
Fax: (519) 740-7722 Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARA CATHARINE HAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Jan 2015 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2015