skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 5:06:28 AM

Tikkanen, Jussi Matias

CPSO#: 98701

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2016
EXPIRY DATE
31 Aug 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Sep 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish, Swedish

Education:University of Helsinki, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4800 Ext. 4019 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jussi Tikkanen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tikkanen ( CPSO# 98701 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Finland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 01 Sep 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2023

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2017 Active
             1.    Dr. Jussi Matias Tikkanen may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Respirology,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr.
                        Tikkanen  holds  an  academic  appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of issuance or when Dr. Tikkanen  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Tikkanen's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when   the  Committee  makes  a  decision  about   Dr.   Tikkanen's
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  September  1,  2016.   In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not  extended  by the
                  Registration Committee automatically expire on August 31, 2023.