skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 11:54:56 AM

Malak, Mariem Isabelle

CPSO#: 98670

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
104 - 4275 Innes Rd
Ottawa ON  K1C 1T1
Phone: (613) 424-6343 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

113 ch montreal
Ottawa ON  K1L 6E8
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mariem Malak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Malak ( CPSO# 98670 )

Business Address:
4275 Innes Road
Suite 104
Ottawa ON  K1C 1T1
Phone Number: (613) 424-6343

Business Address:
624 Wilson Street
Ottawa ON  K1K 4S5
Phone Number: (613) 741-1257

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIEM ISABELLE MALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2015