skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 10:16:57 PM

Bogler, Carolyn Talia Ackerman

CPSO#: 98412

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Family Practice Unit
61 Queen Street East, 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7428 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bogler and Stall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bogler ( CPSO# 98412 )
Dr. N. Stall ( CPSO# 98019 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Family Practice
3rd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7428

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 475
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 864-8000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLYN TALIA ACKERMAN BOGLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2014