skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:17:19 AM

Champion, Caitlin Elizabeth

CPSO#: 98194

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of General Surgery
725 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAITLIN ELIZABETH CHAMPION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 27 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 27 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019