skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 5:46:09 AM

Goyal, Prateek

CPSO#: 97919

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Feb 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
547 Glenridge Ave
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone: (905) 684-4364 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Prateek Goyal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Goyal ( CPSO# 97919 )

Business Address:
547 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone Number: (905) 684-4364

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRATEEK GOYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOYAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2018