skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/04/2019 8:14:53 PM

Torne-Perez, Montserrat

CPSO#: 97909

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:UNIVERSIDAD DEL CAUCA, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WRH Western Campus
Dept of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5184 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

12440 Cortez Blvd
Brooksville FL  34613
United States
Phone: 352-592-4250
Fax: 352-592-4341
County: 
Electoral District: 

Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Dept of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4444
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida

USA - Michigan

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2013 Active
             Dr.  Montserrat  Torne-Perez  may  practise  medicine independently in physical
            medicine and rehabilitation, only.