skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 1:49:12 PM

Burkhart, Aaron Raymond

CPSO#: 97704

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-6060 Ext. 6017 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. R. Burkhart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Burkhart ( CPSO# 97704 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Orthopedics, MG-317
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4884

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AARON RAYMOND BURKHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKHART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017