skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 10:50:48 PM

Singal, Mayank

CPSO#: 97436

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2013 to 29 Dec 2013
Elective Trainee - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2014