skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/07/2019 10:55:49 AM

McLean, Lianne Jennifer

CPSO#: 97176

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 202970 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LIANNE JENNIFER MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2012 to 08 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015