skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 12:50:12 PM

Heelan, Kara

CPSO#: 97161

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2012 to 23 Jan 2012
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2012 to 30 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2012