skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 3:10:15 AM

Chadha, Anuradha

CPSO#: 96891

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chadha Medical
1883 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 7Z9
Phone: (613) 526-2850
Fax: (613) 260-1887 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anu Chadha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chadha ( CPSO# 96891 )

Business Address:
Chadha Medical
1883 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 7Z9
Phone Number: (613) 526-5850

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANURADHA CHADHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013