skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 6:40:27 AM

Ates, Senem

CPSO#: 96838

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2011 to 21 Oct 2011
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2011