skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 4:51:35 AM

Sutradhar, Subir

CPSO#: 96831

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 427-1718 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 700
790 Bay Street
PO Box 71
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: 416-551-6006
Fax: 416-551-6009
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Digestive Health Clinic
Pickering - Village East Medical
1031 Brock Rd
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: 905-683-1700
Fax: 905-683-2577
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Subir Sutradhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sutradhar ( CPSO# 96831 )

Business Address:
502 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 427-1718

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUBIR SUTRADHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTRADHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 26 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016