skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/04/2019 4:29:28 PM

Sharma, Niti

CPSO#: 96743

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Aug 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Indira Gandhi Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
274 Hurst Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 0Z3
Phone: (705) 726-6059 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Niti Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sharma ( CPSO# 96743 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
274 Hurst Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 0Z3
Phone Number: (705) 726-1191


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013 Active
             Dr. Niti Sharma may practice medicine independently in family medicine, only.