skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 4:02:24 AM

Illical, Emmanuel Michael

CPSO#: 96571

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton General Hospital 5 North Room 532 Mailbox 325 1280 Main Street West Hamilton, ON L8S 4K1
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015