skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 12:45:26 AM

Shurrab, Mohammed Alsadeq Nagy Sadeq

CPSO#: 96388

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2024
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:OCTOBER 6 UNIVERSITY, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

865 Regent St
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Shurrab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shurrab ( CPSO# 96388 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
865 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Jun 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2017 to 31 May 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Mohammed Alsadeq Nagy Sadeq Shurrab may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in cardiology in a setting that is approved by the Chair,
                        Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences,
                        Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. Shurrab holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Shurrab no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Shurrab's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Shurrab's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 1, 2018, and expires on June 30, 2024.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Shurrab's academic appointment at the Northern
                  Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to
                  the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.