skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 5:47:28 AM

Ross, Paul Andrew

CPSO#: 96057

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012