skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 10:24:22 PM

Kim, Christopher Kwangil

CPSO#: 95922

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Room 1 East 449
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5267 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kim ( CPSO# 95922 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Room 1 East 449
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5267

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KWANGIL KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016