skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 9:59:41 PM

Horton, Jennifer Lynne

CPSO#: 95793

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20, Avenue Appia
Geneva 1202
Switzerland
Phone: +41795965719

Additional Practice Location(s)

CDK Family Medicine & WalkIn Clinic
Kingston ON  K7L 1A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 766-0318
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNNE HORTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013