skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/04/2019 10:33:04 PM

Jaksa, Peter Juro

CPSO#: 95639

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Junction Road
Toronto ON  M6N 1B5
Phone: (416) 766-1162
Fax: (416) 766-0463 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 6084
Fax: (416) 530-6107
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Jaksa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jaksa ( CPSO# 95639 )

Business Address:
5 Junction Road
Toronto ON  M6N 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 766-1162

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6084

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER JURO JAKSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015