skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:04:10 AM

Snider, Tristan Gregory Edward

CPSO#: 95488

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temiskaming Hospital
421 Sheperdson Rd
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647-8121
Fax: (705) 647-5800 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tristan Snider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Snider ( CPSO# 95488 )

Business Address:
Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-8121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TRISTAN GREGORY EDWARD SNIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2016