skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 10:20:33 PM

Rengarajan, Balaji

CPSO#: 95367

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 16 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017