skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 6:23:12 AM

Tam, Samantha Hwey-Lan

CPSO#: 95212

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016