skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/06/2019 11:26:46 PM

Jayatilaka, Padmali Udayani

CPSO#: 95157

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Colombo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
198 Barton Street East
Stoney Creek ON  L8E2K2
Phone: 9056629463 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

206 Locke Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P4B4
Canada
Phone: 9055700440
Fax: 9055700545
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

50 Dundrun Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3
Canada
Phone: (905) 529-4040
Fax: (905) 529-4494
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Sri Lanka

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Feb 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PADMALI UDAYANI JAYATILAKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYATILAKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 31 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Nov 2018 to 01 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2019