skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 3:57:00 PM

Wesolowski, Marta Anna

CPSO#: 95072

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
L L 02
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6846
Fax: (705) 740-6847 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Marta Wesolowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wesolowski ( CPSO# 95072 )

Business Address:
The Peterborough Clinic
LL 02
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6846

Business Address:
PRHC
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARTA ANNA WESOLOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESOLOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 30 May 2011 to 13 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2013