skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 4:44:47 PM

Smoragiewicz, Martin

CPSO#: 94955

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Dec 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's Cancer Research Institute
Cancer Clinical Trials Division
10 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6430 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cancer Centre
Of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Smoragiewicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Smoragiewicz ( CPSO# 94955 )

Business Address:
Queen's Cancer Research Institute
Cancer Clinical Trials Division
10 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N5
Phone Number: (613) 533-6430

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
T-Wing, TG-260
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARTIN SMORAGIEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMORAGIEWICZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2011 to 08 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017