skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 5:50:59 AM

Kusenthiran, Sri Kasthuri

CPSO#: 94748

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 12 Jan 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 128
101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Canada
Phone: 9052730207
Fax: (866) 837-7291
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kusenthiran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kusenthiran ( CPSO# 94748 )

Business Address:
128-101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (866) 837-7251

Business Address:
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Jul 2012

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2012 Active
             Dr.  Sri  Kasthuri  Kusenthiran  may  practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.