skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/04/2019 10:22:51 PM

Kampitak, Thatchai

CPSO#: 94580

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Chulalongkorn University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 23 Jan 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2012