skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/04/2019 8:03:40 PM

Das, Sunit

CPSO#: 94486

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Oct 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northwestern University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5548
Fax: (416) 864-5596 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Sunit Das may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Neurosurgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Das
                        holds an academic  appointment  at the rank of Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  when  Dr.  Das no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.