skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 4:45:26 PM

Chadwick, Mairi Margaret

CPSO#: 94430

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2010 to 18 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013