skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/07/2019 2:58:35 PM

Nazerali-Maitland, Alasdair Nazir

CPSO#: 94010

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Aug 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2016