skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 4:48:38 AM

Man, Thomas Mink-Kay

CPSO#: 94007

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkdale Queen West CHC
168 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5V 2R4
Phone: (416)703 8480
Fax: (416) 703 8479 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. THOMAS MINK-KAY MAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2012