skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/04/2019 8:36:07 PM

Cole, Eric Brian

CPSO#: 93772

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 875-3920
Fax: (905) 875-4340 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Crystal Fong & Eric Cole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fong ( CPSO# 93560 )
Dr. E. Cole ( CPSO# 93772 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
205 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 875-3920

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC BRIAN COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015