skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/06/2019 11:43:09 PM

Malek, Anna Maria

CPSO#: 93435

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ellis Park Medical
1959 Bloor Street West Unit 2
Toronto ON  M6S 1M4
Phone: (416) 639-6321
Fax: (416) 639-6322 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malek ( CPSO# 93435 )

Business Address:
2 - 1959 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1M4
Phone Number: (416) 639-6321


Corporation Name: Linder Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Linder ( CPSO# 81391 )
Dr. A. Malek ( CPSO# 93435 )

Business Address:
Ellis Park Medical
1959 Bloor Street West
Unit 2 & 3
Toronto ON  M6S 1M4
Phone Number: (416) 639-6321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012