skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/07/2019 10:21:13 AM

Suke, Judith Hunt

CPSO#: 93397

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 870
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 457-1212 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Haliburton Hospital
P O Box 115
7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Canada
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Coles-Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Thomas ( CPSO# 91096 )
Dr. C. Stephenson ( CPSO# 57052 )
Dr. K. Gammon ( CPSO# 58233 )
Dr. A. Conway ( CPSO# 61182 )
Dr. B. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68028 )
Dr. S. Coles ( CPSO# 68010 )
Dr. D. Gilmour ( CPSO# 100637)
Dr. N. Bottum ( CPSO# 55581 )
Dr. J. Suke ( CPSO# 93397 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212


Corporation Name: Judith Suke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Suke ( CPSO# 93397 )

Business Address:
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Aug 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUDITH HUNT SUKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013