skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 5:48:57 AM

Lane, Lynsay Robyn

CPSO#: 93216

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Family Medicine
Teaching Unit
201 Deacon St, Tower C, 2nd Floor
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone: (613) 732-3422
Fax: (613) 732-7115 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lynsay Lane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lane ( CPSO# 93216 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Family Medicine
Teaching Unit
201 Deacon Street, Tower C
2nd Floor
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone Number: (613) 732-3422

Business Address:
725 Pembroke Street West
Pembroke ON  K8A 8S6
Phone Number: (613) 735-0175

Business Address:
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LYNSAY ROBYN LANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012